Senate | 03/11/2021 | Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 30 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Referred to Agriculture and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Withdrawn from General Government committee | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Murdock | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |