House | 04/07/2021 | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Hall |