Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 40
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Bush, Lawson
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron, Provenzano, Sims
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Rosecrants
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Rader
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Haste
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Leewright
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|