Senate | 04/23/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 10 | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | CR; Do Pass Wildlife Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Wildlife | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Dahm |