Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB85 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021
Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2021

Amended

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill February 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2021