Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB856 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2022

Amended

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill February 21, 2021