House | 03/29/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Withdrawn from Finance committee | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Rosino |