Senate | 04/18/2022 | Vetoed 04/18/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 13 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Tourism | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Leewright |