Senate | 04/27/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Hill (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Hall |