Senate | 05/04/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/04/2022 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 13 | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Remove Representative Kannady as principal House author and substitute with Representative Moore | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Howard |