Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB984 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill April 12, 2022
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2021