Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|