House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Montgomery | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Measure failed: Ayes: 23 Nays: 23 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |