House
|
06/12/2023
|
Becomes law without Governor's signature 06/02/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Hays
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
JCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Direct to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 20
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Kendrix, Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Authored by Representative Wallace, Martinez
|
|
|