Senate
|
07/31/2023
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
07/31/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
07/31/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 72 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
07/31/2023
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/24/2023
|
Measure sent to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/24/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 34 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Veto override failed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Vetoed 05/31/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Boren
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
JCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Martinez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger)
|
|
|