Oklahoma 2023 2023 1st Special Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB26 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2023

                     
 
 
An Act 
ENROLLED SENATE 
BILL NO. 26x 	By: Thompson (Roger), Hall, and 
Boren of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Wallace and Martinez of the 
House 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to Tribal-State agreements; affirming 
and offering supplemental compact term to preclude 
the expiration or termination of any compact entered 
pursuant to 68 O.S. Section 346 and in effect as of 
January 1, 2023, until December 31, 2024, at the 
earliest; enacting law to offer the restoration of 
any compact entered into pursuant to 68 O.S. Section 
346 and in effect as of January 1, 2019, but which 
expired without renewal pursuant to its own terms 
thereafter and to preclude the expiration or 
termination thereof until December 31, 2024, at the 
earliest; providing for codification; and providing 
for severability. 
 
 
 
SUBJECT:  Tribal-State agreements 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 346.1 of Title 68, unless there 
is created a duplicatio n in numbering, reads as follows: 
 
A. The Legislature finds that: 
 
1. As codified in Section 1221 of Title 74 of the Oklahoma 
Statutes, Oklahoma’s standing policy is to work in a spirit of 
cooperation with all federally recognized India n tribes in   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 26x 	Page 2 
furtherance of federal policy for the benefit of both the State of 
Oklahoma and Tribal governments; 
 
2. Oklahoma has benefited from its implementation of thi s 
policy through, among other things, the formation and entry of 
intergovernmental agre ements or compacts with Tribal nations on a 
variety of subjects; and 
 
3. As authorized by Section 346 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma 
Statutes, Oklahoma entered numerous com pacts with Tribal nations 
relating to taxation of tobacco product sales, which agreements have 
benefited all parties by reducing intergovernmental disputes, 
increasing Oklahoma tax revenues, and provid ing a stable environment 
for Tribal and non-Tribal economic activity. 
 
B.  Consistent with the Legislature’s intent declared in 
subsection B of Section 346 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statu tes, 
the State of Oklahoma offers the following supplemental term to any 
Tribe that is party to a State-Tribal tobacco products sales tax 
compact entered pursuant to Section 346 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma 
Statutes or otherwise which was in effect on January 1, 2023, but is 
set to expire prior to December 31, 2024: 
 
SUPPLEMENTAL TERM TO 
 
TOBACCO PRODUCTS EXCISE TAX COMPACT 
 
Between the [NAME OF TRIBE] 
 
and the STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
The tobacco products excise tax compact between the [NAME 
OF TRIBE] and the STA TE OF OKLAHOMA is hereby affirmed and 
shall be deemed in effect until December 31, 2024, and 
restored, and any action to unilaterally terminate the compact 
prior to that date shall be null and void. 
 
C. Further and also consistent with such intent, the State of 
Oklahoma offers the following restoration of and supplemental term 
to any Tribe that is party to a State-Tribal tobacco products excise 
tax compact entered pursuant to Section 346 of Title 68 of the   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 26x 	Page 3 
Oklahoma Statutes or otherwise and which was in ef fect as of January 
1, 2019, but which expired prior to the effective date of this act: 
 
RESTORATION OF AND SUPPLEMENTAL TERM TO 
 
TOBACCO PRODUCTS EXCISE TAX COMPACT TERM 
 
Between the [NAME OF TRIBE] 
 
and the STATE OF OKLAHO MA 
 
Notwithstanding its expiration prior to the effective date 
of this act, the tobacco products excise tax compact between 
the [NAME OF TRIBE] and the STATE OF OKLA HOMA in effect on 
January 1, 2019, is hereby affirmed and restored to effect as 
of July 1, 2023, and shall remain in effect until December 31, 
2024, and any action to unilaterally terminate the compact 
prior to that date shall be null and void . 
 
D. Tribal acceptance of an offer codified in either subsection 
B or C of this section shall be indicated by letter from the Tribal 
party’s governing body or official reciting the terms set forth 
above and delivered to the Oklahoma Tax Commission .  Such letter 
shall then be filed with the Secretary of State. 
 
SECTION 2.  The provisions of this act are severable and if any 
part or provision shall be held void the decision of the co urt so 
holding shall not affect or impair any of the remaining pa rts or 
provisions of this act. 
   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 26x 	Page 4 
Passed the Senate the 24th day of May, 2023. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
Passed the House of Representatives the 26th day of May, 2023. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this _______ _____________ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _____ __ M. 
By: _______________________________ __ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this _______ ___ 
day of __________________, 20 _______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _______________________________ __