Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1016 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2023