Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1066 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023