House
|
04/24/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/21/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Talley
|
|
|