House | 05/15/2023 | Approved by Governor 05/15/2023 | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | SA's read, adopted | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | SA's received | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Enacting clause restored | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Sims | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Strom |