Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2023