Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Tedford, Sterling, Hasenbeck, McEntire, Roe
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Stinson, Randleman, Lawson, Baker, Kerbs, McDugle, Strom, West (Josh), Moore, Vancuren, McBride, Martinez
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Fetgatter
|
|
|