Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1385 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 25, 2023