Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Roberts | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter, Davis, Boles, Grego, Hardin | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Bashore |