Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1390 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023