Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Ranson | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator Stewart (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Culver |