Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1443 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023