Senate | 04/10/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 11 | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Alonso-Sandoval | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Patzkowsky |