Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 35 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Sneed |