Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Maynard
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Tedford, Miller
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Stark
|
|
|