Senate | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sneed | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Tourism | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Grego |