House
|
04/19/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/19/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 13
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Authored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Martinez
|
|
|