Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1600 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 20, 2023