House | 03/13/2023 | Remove Representative Worthen as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kane | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Remove Representative Banning as principal House author and substitute with Representative Worthen | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Remove Representative Worthen as principal House author and substitute with Representative Banning | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Worthen | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |