Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Deck | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Pittman | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 10 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Authored by Senator Young (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Goodwin |