Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1633 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Amended

Bill February 24, 2023