House
|
05/17/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/17/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McEntire
|
|
|