Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1658 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2023