Senate | 04/24/2023 | General Order, considered and deferred | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 31; Ayes: 69 Nays: 10 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative McEntire |