Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Marti |