House
|
05/02/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 14
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Townley
|
|
|