House
|
05/15/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/15/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Alvord (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Townley
|
|
|