Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1758 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 17, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill March 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2023