Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1759 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 20, 2023