Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Williams |