Senate | 04/10/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Archer | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Osburn |