House | 05/01/2023 | Vetoed 05/01/2023 | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Authored by Senator Seifried (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | General Order | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Osburn |