House
|
05/26/2023
|
Died in conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Conference granted, GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Deck
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Menz
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Osburn
|
|
|