House | 03/23/2023 | Motion expired | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Conley | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 67 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Authored by Senator Jett (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Referred to Elections and Ethics | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Conley | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |