House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Remove Representative Conley as principal House author and substitute with Representative May | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Conley | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |